OR HB2351 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 192, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 192, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes State Marine Board to adopt special regulations to protect shoreline in Willamette River Greenway.
Title
Relating to motorboats.
Sponsors
Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] |
Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 192, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Olsen, Thatcher, Winters. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-08 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Neron. |
2019-04-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 10--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Stark, Wallan. |
2019-04-04 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-07 | House | Informational Meeting held. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |