OR HB2348 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires hospitals and long term care facilities to make available to patients, residents, staff and visitors plant-based meals and beverages. Requires hospitals and long term care facilities to make available to patients, residents, staff and visitors plant-based meals and beverages. Prohibits hospitals from offering processed meats. Requires Department of Corrections to make available to adults in custody plant-based meals any time meals are served.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to food offerings in certain facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-08HouseReferred to Human Services by order of Speaker.
2021-03-08HouseWithout recommendation as to passage and be referred to Human Services.
2021-03-04HouseWork Session held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Health Care.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback