OR HB2348 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Human Services to reduce employment-related child care subsidy recipient copayments to no more than seven percent of household income. Directs Early Learning Division to develop pilot program in rural area of state that reimburses child care providers for cost of providing high-quality child care rather than percentage of market rate. Appropriates moneys from General Fund for pilot program.] Directs Department of Human Services to set reimbursements for child care providers providing services to recipients of Employment Related Day Care program at 75 percent of market rate. Directs department to reduce subsidy recipient copayments to no more than 10 percent of household income. Directs department to contract with child care providers to provide off-hour child care in counties where no more than 10 percent of children zero to three years of age have access to child care.] Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department. Declares emergency, effective on July 1, 2019.].
Title
Relating to employment-related child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |