OR HB2342 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Board of Education to adopt by rule complaint process to report school district policy in violation of state law prohibiting harassment, intimidation, bullying and cyberbullying. Directs board to adopt rules relating to complaint investigation and standards to determine whether school district policy prohibiting harassment, intimidation, bullying and cyberbullying complies with and is applied in accordance with state law. Directs Department of Education to establish system to track number of reported incidences of harassment, intimidation, bullying or cyberbullying that occur in each school district. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to procedures for hostile education environments; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Student Success. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2342 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2342/Introduced |