OR HB2342 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Chapter 626, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Chapter 626, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Consumer and Business Services to adopt rules not in compliance with Insurance Code if necessary due to change in federal law or decision by federal agency that Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services determines will cause imminent destabilization of insurance market and risk life or health of state residents. Prohibits department from failing to comply with statutory provisions requiring coverage of specific providers, items, services and essential health benefits and provisions limiting preexisting condition exclusions. Rules adopted pursuant to authority granted by Act may be in effect for no longer than six months. Department must immediately report actions taken to President of Senate, Speaker of House of Representatives and committees of Legislative Assembly related to health, and must report each calendar quarter thereafter. Sunsets July 1, 2019. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health insurance; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-10 | House | Chapter 626, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2017. |
2017-08-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 37; Nays, 22--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Girod. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed.Ayes, 41; Nays, 18--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Hayden, Heard, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-05-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-09 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-20 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2017-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |