OR HB2341 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 356, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes tax collector in county covered by state of emergency declared by Governor due to fire or act of God, or authority of Governor under Emergency Conflagration Act, who knows or has reason to believe property has been destroyed or damaged by fire or act of God to prorate taxes imposed on property. Authorizes tax collector in county covered by state of emergency declared by Governor due to fire or act of God, or authority of Governor under Emergency Conflagration Act, who knows or has reason to believe property has been destroyed or damaged by fire or act of God to prorate taxes imposed on property. Combines provisions for proration of taxes for property destroyed and property damaged by fire or act of God. Provides new computation for proration of taxes for property other than specially assessed property. Applies to property tax years beginning on or after July 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to taxation of damaged property; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Rules suspended (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 356, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
2021-06-23HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-16SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-14HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-10SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-10SenateThird reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard.
2021-06-09SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-09SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-06-02SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-15SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue.
2021-04-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-08HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Clem, Smith G, Speaker Kotek.
2021-04-08HouseMotion to suspend the rules passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Clem, Smith G, Speaker Kotek.. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Clem, Smith G, Speaker Kotek.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseCarried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
2021-03-31HouseCarried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-30HouseCarried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-29HouseCarried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-24HouseCarried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-22HouseSecond reading.
2021-03-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-03-11HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-10HouseReferred to Revenue by prior reference.
2021-02-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
2021-02-08HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-01HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Wildfire Recovery with subsequent referral to Revenue.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2341
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2341/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2341/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31090
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31396
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=513911
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=514743
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32792
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=529483

Bill Comments

feedback