OR HB2341 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 152, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 25, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 152, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 25, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updates Insurance Code provisions applicable to health insurance in accordance with federal requirements. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health insurance; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 152, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 25, 2017. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 45; Nays, 14--Barreto, Esquivel, Huffman, Johnson, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed.Ayes, 44; Nays, 16--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Huffman, Johnson, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson. |
2017-03-21 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |