OR HB2340 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Department of Human Services for transition services for current foster children and former foster children. Appropriates moneys to Department of Human Services for transition services for current foster children and former foster children. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to transition services for foster children; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Raquel Moore-Green [R] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] |
Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |