OR HB2338 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 71, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 71, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies only one monthly benefit rate for children of deceased worker and uniform duration of benefits for children under 19 years of age. Specifies benefit for period of not more than 48 months for children and dependents of deceased worker who are between 19 and 26 years of age at worker's death or will attain age of 19 years after worker's death and who are completing high school, obtaining general educational development certificate or attending program of higher education. Provides that if worker dies during period of permanent total disability, benefits are payable to worker's dependents.
Title
Relating to workers' compensation benefits for certain beneficiaries.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Chapter 71, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2017-03-13 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |