OR HB2337 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 70, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 70, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases workers' compensation benefits for permanent total disability . Increases workers' compensation benefits for permanent total disability.
Title
Relating to workers' compensation benefit amounts for permanent disability.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Chapter 70, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Boquist, Girod, Linthicum. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2017-03-13 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |