OR HB2331 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 421, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 421, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes from meaning of "communication," for purposes of central assessment for property taxation, services of television and radio stations licensed by Federal Communications Commission that use primarily earth-based transmitters to broadcast programming via radio waves to television or radio receivers that use indoor or outdoor antennas for reception. Excludes over-the-air broadcasting] from meaning of "communication," for purposes of central assessment for property taxation, services of television and radio stations licensed by Federal Communications Commission that use primarily earth-based transmitters to broadcast programming via radio waves to television or radio receivers that use indoor or outdoor antennas for reception. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to over-the-air broadcasting; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Rep. Bill Post [R] | Rep. Werner Reschke [R] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] |
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Sen. Charles Riley [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 421, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bonham. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Clem, Leif, Nearman. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |