OR HB2329 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 650, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 650, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of "energy facility" for purposes of regulation of energy facilities by Energy Facility Siting Council. Broadens provisions for types of electric power generating plants that may elect to obtain site certificate from council if otherwise not required to obtain site certificate. Allows counties to approve permits for certain small renewable energy facilities. Establishes permit criteria.
Title
Relating to energy facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Sen. Cliff Bentz [R] | Rep. Cheri Helt [R] | Rep. Karin Power [D] |
Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | House | Chapter 650, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 2--Olsen, Thatcher; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 7--Boshart Davis, Drazan, Hayden, Holvey, Nearman, Post, Wallan; Excused, 1--Clem. |
2019-06-20 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-10 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-06-05 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |