OR HB2328 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-11 - Chapter 353, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-11 - Chapter 353, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Commission on Black Affairs, Commission for Women and Commission on Asian and Pacific Islander Affairs to meet at least annually in joint session to consider and act on issues of mutual concern.
Title
Relating to advocacy commissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | House | Chapter 353, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Ferrioli, President Courtney. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-05-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Davis, Lively, Read, Speaker Kotek. |
2013-05-01 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-04-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |