OR HB2323 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 291, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 291, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits knowingly communicating materially false statement, including by electronic or telephonic means, with intent to mislead electors about date of election, deadline for delivering ballot, voter registration deadline, method of registering to vote, locations at which elector may deposit ballot, qualifications of electors or voter registration status within 30 days of primary election or special election or within 60 days of general election. Prohibits knowingly communicating materially false statement, including by electronic or telephonic means, with intent to mislead electors about date of election, deadline for delivering ballot, voter registration deadline, method of registering to vote, locations at which elector may deposit ballot, qualifications of electors or voter registration status within 30 days of primary election or special election or within 60 days of general election. Authorizes Attorney General] Secretary of State to prosecute violation and establishes civil penalty of up to $10,000 for violation. Expressly states that current prohibition on circulating materially false statement relating to candidate, political committee or measure includes circulation by electronic or telephonic means. Prohibits printing or circulation of imitation voters' pamphlet unless pamphlet is clearly marked as unofficial. Establishes fine of up to $10,000 for violation.
Title
Relating to communicating false information about an election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 291, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Heard, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Kennemer. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-05-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey, Zika. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 3--Post, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 3--Alonso Leon, Nearman, Power. |
2021-05-06 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |