OR HB2322 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Land Conservation and Development Commission to amend statewide land use planning goals related to energy conservation to incorporate development of renewable energy facilities and reduction of greenhouse gas emissions and to match state energy policies. Requires Land Conservation and Development Commission to amend statewide land use planning goals related to energy conservation to incorporate development of renewable energy facilities and reduction of greenhouse gas emissions and to match state energy policies. Requires commission to provide report on progress to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2020. Appropriates moneys to Department of Land Conservation and Development for purpose of administering and implementing Act. Declares emergency, effective on July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the adoption of energy policies into statewide land use planning goals; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |