OR HB2321 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to convene advisory committee to study adequacy of personal protective equipment provided to health care workers to protect against SARS-CoV-2 and to report findings to interim committee of Legislative Assembly. Requires Oregon Health Authority to convene advisory committee to study adequacy of personal protective equipment provided to health care workers to protect against SARS-CoV-2 and to report findings to interim committee of Legislative Assembly. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care workers; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2321 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2321/Introduced |