OR HB2320 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 820, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision to adopt sex offender risk assessment methodology to classify sex offenders into risk levels. Directs board to classify persons convicted of certain sex crimes and sentenced to imprisonment. Directs Psychiatric Security Review Board or Oregon Health Authority to classify persons found guilty except for insanity of sex crimes. Authorizes Oregon Youth Authority or county juvenile department to register certain juvenile sex offenders. Requires certain sex offenders moving into state or convicted in another jurisdiction to report to Department of State Police or law enforcement agency in county of residence instead of Department of State Police in Marion County. Provides that failure or refusal to participate in risk assessment constitutes crime of failure to report as a sex offender. Prohibits Internet release of information concerning sex offender under jurisdiction of Psychiatric Security Review Board or Oregon Health Authority. Repeals provisions relating to juvenile predatory sex offenders. Extends tenancy termination provisions and crimes related to unlawful contact with children to unclassified former predatory sex offenders and certain level three sex offenders. Requires sharing of certain information among Psychiatric Security Review Board, Oregon Health Authority and State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision for purposes of sex offender classification. Authorizes Oregon Youth Authority and juvenile department to disclose information to Psychiatric Security Review Board, Oregon Health Authority and State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision for purposes of sex offender classification. Extends time in which State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision, or Psychiatric Security Review Board in certain circumstances, must classify existing registrants to December 1, 2018. Provides for default classification of sex offenders who fail or refuse to participate in risk assessment. Requires juvenile court to hold hearing at end of jurisdiction over juvenile to determine whether juvenile must report as sex offender. Specifies procedures for holding hearings and standard of proof. Extends permissible age difference between victim and person convicted of certain sex crime to three years and 180 days for purpose of order setting aside conviction. Requires certain court findings for orders in which age difference is between two years and 180 days and three years and 180 days. Authorizes person living outside state to file petition for order relieving person of obligation to report as sex offender as result of adjudication in Oregon juvenile court. Provides that State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision hearings are presumed to be panel hearings. Authorizes minimum panel of three board members to make and review certain decisions. Authorizes chairperson of board to require all voting members of board to participate in hearing or decision. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision for purposes related to panel hearings. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to crime; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-07-06 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed C-Eng) (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Without recommendation, with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 820, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
2015-08-12HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-13SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-06HouseRules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 44; Nays, 13--Davis, Evans, Hack, Hayden, Johnson, Kennemer, McLain, McLane, Parrish, Piluso, Sprenger, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Buehler, Gallegos; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Clem.
2015-07-06SenateThird reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 22; nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Knopp, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett.
2015-07-03SenateSecond reading.
2015-07-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed C-Eng.)
2015-07-03SenateWork Session held.
2015-07-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-06-30SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-06-30HouseThird reading. Carried by Barker. Passed.Ayes, 53; Nays, 7--Barreto, Evans, McLain, Piluso, Post, Weidner, Whitsett.
2015-06-29HouseSecond reading.
2015-06-29HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2015-06-26HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-22HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-22HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-06-11HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
2015-04-27HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2015-04-27HouseWithout recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2015-04-20HouseWork Session held.
2015-04-16HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-01-16HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2320
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2320/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2320/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2320/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2320/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2320/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2320/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2320/C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2320/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21894
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23216
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=363160
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23440
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364938
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=365089

Bill Comments

feedback