OR HB2318 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 385, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 385, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows State Parks and Recreation Commission to adopt schedule by rule setting forth range of reasonable charges for use of areas established and maintained by State Parks and Recreation Department. Allows State Parks and Recreation Director to, no more than four times per year and with approval of commission, adjust fees assessed for use of areas established and maintained by department without legislative approval. Requires fees set by director to be within range of reasonable charges adopted by commission and approved by Legislative Assembly.
Title
Relating to State Parks and Recreation Department fees.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass the bill. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass the bill. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Chapter 385, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Linthicum; excused, 2--Boquist, Monnes Anderson. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-11 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-05-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |