OR HB2317 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Chapter 4, (2019 Laws): Effective date March 20, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Chapter 4, (2019 Laws): Effective date March 20, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates May of each year as ALS Awareness Month. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to ALS Awareness Month; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Chapter 4, (2019 Laws): Effective date March 20, 2019. |
2019-03-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--President Courtney, Riley, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Doherty, Bonham. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, Smith G. |
2019-02-06 | House | Second reading. |
2019-02-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |