OR HB2316 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 102, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 102, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires city with population of less than 25,000 to determine estimated housing need for 20-year period, inventory buildable land and adopt measures as part of periodic or legislative review of comprehensive plan.
Title
Relating to review of comprehensive plans that require application of statewide planning goal concerning buildable lands for residential use for certain cities.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Chapter 102, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 22; nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, DeBoer, Girod, Kruse, Linthicum, Thatcher, Winters; excused, 1--Gelser. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed.Ayes, 38; Nays, 22--Barker, Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson. |
2017-03-22 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |