OR HB2315 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Chapter 284, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Chapter 284, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that corporate excise tax credit allowed to lenders that finance affordable housing is not barred by receipt of housing vouchers by tenants. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax credit for affordable housing lenders; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | Chapter 284, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017. |
2017-06-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Ferrioli, Olsen. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Carried over to 05-31 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed.Ayes, 56; Absent, 1--Keny-Guyer; Excused, 3--Boone, Gorsek, Hack. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-03 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | Subsequent referral to Revenue rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2017-03-31 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Revenue be rescinded. |
2017-03-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |