OR HB2314 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows operator of motorcycle or moped to travel between lanes of traffic under certain conditions.
Title
Relating to vehicle filtering in traffic slowdowns.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Wilson [R] | Rep. Karin Power [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Rep. Bill Post [R] |
Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Rep. Jeff Barker [D] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] |
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. John Lively [D] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] |
Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Sen. Shemia Fagan [D] |
Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Sen. Alan Olsen [R] | Sen. Charles Riley [D] |
Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2314 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2314/Introduced |