OR HB2312 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 219, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 219, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that lawful units of land whose property lines are relocated by certain judgments remain lawful units. Provides that lawful units of land whose property lines are relocated by certain judgments remain lawful units. Prohibits requiring additional validating procedures or denying permits because of judicial boundary changes.
Title
Relating to judgments affecting lawful units of land.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 219, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 8--Boquist, Findley, Frederick, Hansell, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Levy; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |