OR HB2312 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 584, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 584, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires seller disclosure form to include warning regarding flood insurance. Requires seller of property to disclose whether seller has ever purchased] disclosure form to include warning regarding flood insurance.
Title
Relating to flood insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - House - House Repassed (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Committee House concur in Senate amendments dated 05/14 and repass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Committee House concur in Senate amendments dated 05/14 and repass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Chapter 584, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-07-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-24 | House | Repassed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 11--Barker, Fahey, Holvey, Meek, Nearman, Noble, Reschke, Sollman, Stark, Wallan, Zika; Excused, 1--Clem. |
2019-06-24 | House | House adopted Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read in Senate. |
2019-06-20 | House | Conference Committee Recommendation: House concur in Senate amendments dated May 14, 2019 and bill be repassed. |
2019-06-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senators Dembrow, Girod, Riley appointed Senate conferees. |
2019-06-13 | House | Representatives Reardon, Meek, Zika appointed House conferees. |
2019-06-13 | House | House refused to concur in Senate amendments. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Knopp, Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Nearman, Post, Reschke, Stark; Excused, 2--Clem, Findley. |
2019-03-06 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |