OR HB2311 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 218, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 218, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies conditions for requiring, issuing and maintaining in effect surety bond or irrevocable letter of credit for person that creates, attaches, asserts or claims lien in connection with making, altering, repairing, transporting, storing, performing services, supplying materials or performing labor in connection with motor vehicle. Specifies conditions for requiring, issuing and maintaining in effect surety bond or irrevocable letter of credit for person that creates, attaches, asserts or claims lien in connection with making, altering, repairing, transporting, storing, performing services, supplying materials or performing labor in connection with motor vehicle. Specifies persons that are exempt from requirement to maintain surety bond or irrevocable letter of credit. Becomes operative on January 1, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to security for claims of lien in connection with work performed on motor vehicles; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 218, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, Smith Warner. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Findley, Frederick, Thatcher. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-03-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Evans, Leif, Rayfield. |
2021-03-09 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |