OR HB2310 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals those provisions of Drug Addiction Treatment and Recovery Act of 2020 (Ballot Measure 110 (2020)) that pertain to decriminalization of possession of drugs. Repeals those provisions of Drug Addiction Treatment and Recovery Act of 2020 (Ballot Measure 110 (2020)) that pertain to decriminalization of possession of drugs. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to drugs; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Lewis [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Kevin Mannix [R] | Rep. Jami Cate [R] |
Rep. Tracy Cramer [R] | Rep. Ed Diehl [R] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Rep. Emily McIntire [R] |
Rep. Werner Reschke [R] | Rep. Brian Stout [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-05-17 | House | Motion to withdraw from Judiciary failed. Ayes, 30; Nays, 30--Andersen, Bowman, Bynum, Chaichi, Dexter, Fahey, Gamba, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Reynolds, Ruiz, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |