OR HB2310 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits local government, local contracting agency or local contract review board from enacting, adopting or enforcing ordinance, resolution, rule or other law that prohibits, restricts or limits evaluation, comparison or use of pipe or piping materials for water project if pipe or piping materials meet current standards or performance specifications of specified organizations and moneys appropriated from State Treasury directly or indirectly provided funding for water project. Prohibits local government, local contracting agency or local contract review board from enacting, adopting or enforcing ordinance, resolution, rule or other law that prohibits, restricts or limits evaluation, comparison or use of pipe or piping materials for water project if pipe or piping materials meet current standards or performance specifications of specified organizations and moneys appropriated from State Treasury directly or indirectly provided funding for water project. Becomes operative on January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to materials for local water projects; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Water. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2310 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2310/Introduced |