OR HB2308 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Chapter 628, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Chapter 628, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that in calculation of maximum period of commitment for defendant lacking fitness to proceed, defendant must receive credit for each day defendant is held in jail unless defendant is charged with certain offenses requiring mandatory minimum sentences.
Title
Relating to the maximum period of commitment.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-10 | House | Chapter 628, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-08-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Johnson, Thomsen. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng.) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Motion to refer to Rules carried by voice vote. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |