OR HB2306 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 397, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 397, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires city or county to issue residential building permits upon substantial completion of construction of public improvements in residential subdivisions.
Title
Relating to residential subdivisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] |
Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] | Sen. Dallas Heard [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Chapter 397, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 60. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Carried over to 05-16 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Housing. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Keny-Guyer; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Smith G, Smith Warner. |
2019-04-02 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |