OR HB2305 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from state income tax military pay received by Oregon National Guard member while in active service of state or on state active duty. Exempts from state income tax military pay received by Oregon National Guard member while in active service of state or on state active duty. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to military pay; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Tax Expenditures (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of Speaker. |
2023-03-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Tax Expenditures. |
2023-03-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |