OR HB2303 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-30 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows pharmacist to prescribe and dispense pseudoephedrine to person who is at least 18 years of age and who provides to pharmacist person's valid government-issued photo identification. Allows pharmacist or pharmacy technician to transfer drug containing pseudoephedrine without prescription to person who is at least 18 years of age and presents person's valid government-issued photo identification. Requires pharmacist or pharmacy technician, prior to transfer, to submit specified information into electronic system designed to prevent illegal transfer of drugs containing pseudoephedrine. Requires pharmacist or pharmacy technician to record specified information about transfer of drug containing pseudoephedrine. Specifies maximum amount of pseudoephedrine that person may receive without prescription. Establishes storage requirements for drug containing pseudoephedrine. Clarifies that measure does not apply to drugs transferred pursuant to prescription. Punishes violation by 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both.] Requires pharmacist to query prescription monitoring program prior to prescription and dispensation. Limits amount of pseudoephedrine person may receive. Allows State Board of Pharmacy to adopt rules. Removes provision subjecting records of specified transactions to inspection by board and law enforcement agencies. Becomes operative January 1, 2020. Sunsets December 31, 2023.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to pseudoephedrine; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2019-05-22SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
2019-05-21SenateCarried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent.
2019-05-20SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-17SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2019-05-09SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-08SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2019-04-15SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-11HouseThird reading. Carried by Post, Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 22--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Doherty, Gomberg, Greenlick, Helt, Hernandez, Holvey, Lewis, Marsh, McLane, Neron, Piluso, Power, Rayfield, Sanchez, Smith DB, Smith G, Smith Warner, Wallan, Williams, Williamson; Excused, 5--Barreto, Keny-Guyer, Noble, Sprenger, Stark.
2019-04-10HouseSecond reading.
2019-04-09HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-04-02HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Health Care.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2303
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2303/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2303/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2303/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2303/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2303/B-Engrossed
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28577
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=458957
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29389
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=468572

Bill Comments

feedback