OR HB2303 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 384, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 384, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies date by which coordinated care organization must report to Oregon Health Authority proportion of total medical costs allocated to primary care. Removes obsolete references to Office for Oregon Health Policy and Research and community-based health care initiatives.
Title
Relating to health policy.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Chapter 384, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Gelser. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Boone, Lininger, McKeown, Piluso; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Smith G. |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-18 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |