OR HB2294 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 47, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 47, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds persons representing public to policy committees established by Board on Public Safety Standards and Training.
Title
Relating to the addition of persons representing the public to the policy committees established by the board that develops individuals into public safety providers.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | House | Chapter 47, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Thomsen; excused, 3--Boquist, Monroe, Olsen. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Carried over to 05-04 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Carried over to 05-03 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-02-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-02-09 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |