OR HB2293 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates penalty for unbonded or unlicensed sale or distribution of use fuel. Increases penalty for late filing of motor vehicle fuel statement by dealer. Increases penalty for unlicensed use of fuel in motor vehicle. Imposes penalty for late filing of use fuel report by seller or user. Changes description of Indian jurisdictions excluded from exported fuel exemption from motor vehicle fuel license tax. Creates presumption of nonpayment of tax on exported motor vehicle fuel upon failure to produce proof of payment of tax or exemption. Advances sunset date of exemption for biodiesel blend fuel.
Title
Relating to motor vehicle fuel.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Transportation Policy. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2293 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2293/Introduced |