OR HB2292 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Human Services to contract with nonprofit organization to implement and administer program to assist recipients of supplemental nutrition assistance in purchasing locally grown fruits and vegetables from farmers' markets, farm share sites and retail outlets that participate in program. Requires Department of Human Services to contract with nonprofit organization to implement and administer program to assist recipients of supplemental nutrition assistance in purchasing locally grown fruits and vegetables from farmers' markets, farm share sites and retail outlets that participate in program. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department to be distributed to nonprofit organization that has contracted with department to implement and administer program and match amounts that recipient spends on certain eligible foods. Sunsets January 2, 2024. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to program providing financial assistance to recipients who receive supplemental nutrition assistance; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback