OR HB2291 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Business Development Department to submit report to interim legislative committees regarding economic development no later than July 1, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to economic development; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-24 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2015-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |