OR HB2289 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 217, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes alternative process for alteration, restoration or replacement of certain uses affected by 2020 wildfires. Directs Housing and Community Services Department to study issues relating to building in areas affected by wildfires and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022.] Establishes alternative process for alteration, restoration or replacement of certain uses affected by 2020 wildfires. Expands eligibility to repair or replace subsurface sewage disposal system for dwellings approved under alternative process. Sunsets December 31, 2022] January 2, 2031. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to building in areas affected by wildfires; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 217, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
2021-06-11HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-27SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-05-27SenateGirod declared potential conflict of interest by unanimous consent.
2021-05-27SenateThird reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Findley, Frederick, Thatcher.
2021-05-26SenateSecond reading.
2021-05-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-05-17SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-05-10SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-05SenateReferred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery.
2021-05-04SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-05-04HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Alonso Leon, Bonham, Helm, Nearman.
2021-05-04HouseRules suspended. Rules suspended to allow for immediate consideration.
2021-05-04HouseSecond reading.
2021-04-29HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-04-22HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-19HouseWork Session cancelled.
2021-03-29HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Wildfire Recovery.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2289
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2289/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2289/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2289/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2289/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32126
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=519177
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32446
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=525679

Bill Comments

feedback