OR HB2286 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Wildlife. Establishes Task Force on Wildlife. Directs task force to report to committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to natural resources no later than September 15, 2022. Sunsets December 31, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to wildlife; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2286 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2286/Introduced |