OR HB2286 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 85, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 85, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Places civil forfeiture proceeds used to fund scholarship for children of deceased or disabled public safety officers in account established or designated by State Treasurer in Oregon 529 Savings Network, rather than in Oregon 529 College Savings Plan Subaccount.
Title
Relating to investment of moneys used to fund scholarship program for children of public safety officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 85, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Riley, Winters. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Keny-Guyer; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Smith G, Smith Warner. |
2019-04-02 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |