OR HB2284 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 216, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 216, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Hemp Commission. Establishes Oregon Hemp Commission. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to hemp; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Jami Cate [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Rep. Anna Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 216, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Findley, Johnson, Robinson; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith DB, Clem. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Hudson, Leif, Nearman, Noble. |
2021-04-20 | House | Carried over to April 26, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-19 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-15 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |