OR HB2277 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Water Resources Department to study laws related to water and to provide results of study in report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Directs Water Resources Department to study laws related to water and to provide results of study in report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to water; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Water. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2277 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2277/Introduced |