OR HB2274 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases rate of taxation on cigarettes. Increases rate of taxation on cigarettes. Distributes tax revenues from increases in cigarette tax to Oregon Health Authority to provide preventive services and innovative, nontraditional health services, including mental health services and treatment for substance use disorders, through coordinated care organizations. Applies to distributions of cigarettes occurring on or after January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to taxation of products containing nicotine; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2274 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2274/Introduced |