OR HB2271 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 303, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes Veteran Educational Bridge Grant Program permanent. Makes Veteran Educational Bridge Grant Program permanent. Expands eligibility criteria for veterans to receive grant under program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Veteran Educational Bridge Grant Program.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-26HouseChapter 303, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
2023-07-18HouseGovernor signed.
2023-06-24SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-22SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2023-06-22SenateThird reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 24; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-21SenateCarried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-20SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-20SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-06-15SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-06-15SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-06-07HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Levy B; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Dexter.
2023-06-07HouseSecond reading.
2023-06-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-05-31HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-24HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2023-05-24HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-12HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2023-02-22HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2023-02-22HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2023-02-21HouseWork Session held.
2023-02-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB2271
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2271/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2271/Enrolled
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/65246
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74228
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74272
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74301
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/260300
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264520
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261664
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261770
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261898
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274498
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275141
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275222
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80106
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80528
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34344
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35956
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=584887
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=589064

Bill Comments

feedback