OR HB2267 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Chapter 529, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Chapter 529, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires coordinated care organization to conduct community health assessment and adopt community health improvement plan in collaboration with local public health authorities and hospitals. Requires Oregon Health Authority to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health, no later than September 20, 2020, on implementation of provisions requiring coordinated care organization governing boards to be more transparent.] Authorizes Oregon Health Authority to administer reinsurance program for coordinated care organizations and specifies requirements for program. Establishes Tribal Advisory Council. Specifies duties and membership. Requires coordinated care organization to have tribal liaison who is overseen by Tribal Advisory Council. Provides that council and liaisons facilitate communication between coordinated care organizations and providers of Indian health services. Excludes coordinated care organizations from definition of "small business" with respect to rulemaking requirements. Requires governing body of coordinated care organization to include at least two members of community advisory council who are current or former medical assistance recipients or who are caregivers of current or former medical assistance recipients.
Title
Relating to coordinated care organizations.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | House | Chapter 529, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-07-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Bentz. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-06-12 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-04 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-28 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |