OR HB2265 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to establish by rule process to register medical marijuana grow sites. Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to study cannabis. Requires report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to economic development.] Sunsets January 2, 2022.] Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to establish by rule process to register medical marijuana grow sites. Defines "medical marijuana grow site." Allows medical marijuana grow sites to apply for registration not later than June 1, 2022. Establishes plant production limits for medical marijuana grow sites registered by commission. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to cannabis; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |