OR HB2264 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Work Session held.
Pending: House Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts from property taxation property consisting of machinery, equipment, tools, implements or fixtures used primarily in agricultural or horticultural activities or animal husbandry, regardless of whether property is considered real property, and adds such property to definition of "tangible personal property." Adds farming tools and implements to tax-exempt personal property and adds preparing farm crops for shipping as tax-exempt use of personal property. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to property tax exemption for certain farm equipment; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseWork Session held.
2019-02-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Revenue.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback