OR HB2263 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on Student Housing for purpose of examining student housing availability and funding at post-secondary institutions of education with goal of developing specific and actionable recommendations to improve student housing availability, accessibility and affordability and recommendations on how institutions can be open, welcoming and safe places for houseless students. Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to conduct study to determine how best to coordinate post-secondary education in Oregon. Directs commission to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to higher education not later than September 15, 2024.] Establishes Task Force on Student Housing for purpose of examining student housing availability and funding at post-secondary institutions of education with goal of developing specific and actionable recommendations to improve student housing availability, accessibility and affordability and recommendations on how institutions can be open, welcoming and safe places for houseless students. Establishes Task Force on Student Access to Child Care for purpose of reviewing state-provided child care grants and campus-based child care centers to determine what combination of direct student support and state grants would meet needs of greatest number of students and to provide recommendations on legislation that would best increase access and provide affordable child care to students enrolled at post-secondary institutions of education. Requires task forces to submit report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to higher education by September 15, 2024. Sunsets task forces on December 31, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to higher education; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-04-04HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2023-04-04HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2023-03-28HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-23HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Higher Education.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB2263
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2263/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2263/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2263/A-Engrossed
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23230
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23679
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76788
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/65238
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76793
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76993
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267014
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266928
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267168
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267988
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267989
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77788
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34864

Bill Comments

feedback