OR HB2263 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Oregon Liquor Control Commission to allow marijuana producer and marijuana processor to establish internal inventory tracking systems to track by batch production and processing of marijuana. Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to study recreational marijuana tracking. Requires report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to economic development.] Sunsets January 2, 2022.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.] Authorizes Oregon Liquor Control Commission to allow marijuana producer and marijuana processor to establish internal inventory tracking systems to track by batch production and processing of marijuana. Allows commission to audit internal inventory tracking systems and allow marijuana producer or marijuana processor to use internal inventory tracking system in lieu of commission's tracking system. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Prohibits commission from requiring individual plant tracking tags. Becomes operative July 1, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to recreational marijuana tracking; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |