OR HB2263 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 383, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 383, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases fee from $500 to $625 for third mediation session conducted by mediator assigned by Employment Relations Board to resolve labor dispute or labor controversy. Decreases fee from $750 to $625 for fourth mediation session. Allows board to establish fees for providing labor relations and negotiation training.
Title
Relating to fees charged by the Employment Relations Board.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Chapter 383, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Thatcher; excused, 1--Monnes Anderson. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Workforce, then Ways and Means. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-02-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 48; Nays, 8--Bentz, Buehler, Hayden, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Sprenger, Wilson; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Olson, Speaker Kotek. |
2017-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-10 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2017-02-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2017-02-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |