OR HB2262 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Business Development Department to study use of economic development methods for purposes related to public infrastructure and to report its findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to economic development on or before September 15, 2022. Directs Oregon Business Development Department to study use of economic development methods for purposes related to public infrastructure and to report its findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to economic development on or before September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023.
Title
Relating to economic development related to public infrastructure.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lively [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2262 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2262/Introduced |